Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S CHURCH, GILDERSOME
Charity number: 1175182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Potts | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN SMITH | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Morley | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Pearson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Duxbury | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA FARNHILL | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Clark | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Bell | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth May Knight | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patrick Nicolas Adam Senior | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Panther | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Kelly | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY SMITH | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE LONSDALE | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAWN ELIZABETH PEARCE | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.