Accounts and annual returns WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF INSURERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1175425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 30 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 15 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window