CHRISTIAN RESPONSIBILITY IN PUBLIC AFFAIRS

Charity number: 1177663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORD GRIFFITHS OF FFORESTFACH Chair 10 May 1968
ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND EUROPE Received: On time
THE CENTRE FOR ENTERPRISE, MARKETS AND ETHICS Received: On time
Professor LORD MCCOLL OF DULWICH CBE Trustee 24 May 1998 None on record
RUTH MARIA KELLY Trustee 30 January 2016
SEIDS Overdue by 28 days
THE SHARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHRISTIAN RESPONSIBILITY IN PUBLIC AFFAIRS Received: On time
STEWART WORTH NEWTON Trustee 18 April 2014
CHRISTIAN RESPONSIBILITY IN PUBLIC AFFAIRS Received: On time
THE STEWART NEWTON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
PHILIP KENNETH WOOD Trustee 05 March 2001
THE CENTRE FOR ENTERPRISE, MARKETS AND ETHICS Received: On time
Rev John Lenton Trustee 13 September 2018
ANGLICAN MISSIONERS OF AFRICA DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION TRUST Overdue by 28 days
Anne Devlin Trustee 12 April 2018
CHRISTIAN RESPONSIBILITY IN PUBLIC AFFAIRS Received: On time