BARROW HILL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1176069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON REDDING Chair 04 December 2017
BED FACTORY CIO Recently registered
Charles Scarf Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
Michelle Vickers Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
Lynne Haywood Trustee 04 December 2017 None on record
Janice Bather Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Marion Thorpe Trustee 26 January 2021
TOUCHSTONE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT Received: 37 days late
JUNCTION ARTS LTD Received: On time