Accounts and annual returns TIMPERLEY (RIDDINGS) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 510939

Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1553 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window