BETLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 510948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS M JOHNSTON Trustee None on record
RICHARD HEAD Chair 24 September 2012 None on record
Anthony Turner Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
JUDITH BETTLEY-SMITH Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Patricia Gee Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Jacqueline Hemmings Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Lee Spragg Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Charlotte Louisa Daly Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
BERNARD SWIFT Trustee 24 September 2012 None on record
Chris Woods Trustee 31 March 2017 None on record
EVELINE A BISHOP Trustee None on record
Kevin Locke Trustee 11 December 2019
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE HEALTH & SAFETY GROUP Received: On time
Rebecca Annette Fletcher Trustee 01 December 2019 None on record
CHRISTINE HAWKESLEY Trustee 24 September 2012 None on record
IAN WALTON Trustee None on record
MICHAEL R SMITH Trustee 11 January 2013 None on record
DIANA WOODS Trustee 24 September 2012 None on record