Trustees THE SIGNALLING RECORD SOCIETY
Charity number: 1176506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy May Anderson | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Wilks | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Melton | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Reginald Instone | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVENPORT | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Sharpe | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FOSTER | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.