New Model Institute for Technology and Engineering

Charity number: 1176550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 02 August 2019 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 02 August 2019 63 days late Download