CREATING CHAOS

Charity number: 1176831
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 January 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 January 2021 81 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 January 2021 447 days late Download