CREATING CHAOS

Charity number: 1176831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide community support and activities to help to improve the local area for all residents, but in particular those that would be deemed vulnerable. These tasks and supports are offered by young adults with learning disabilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £61,266
Total expenditure: £58,355

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSE STONE Chair 12 April 2017
None on record
Matthew Charters Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
HANNAH THOMPSON Trustee 12 April 2017
None on record
KERRY WHAPSHOTT Trustee 12 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £70.08k £62.67k £65.37k £61.75k £61.27k
Total expenditure £53.36k £67.25k £42.70k £61.29k £58.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 March 2024 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 March 2024 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 January 2024 430 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 January 2024 430 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2022 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2022 352 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 January 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 January 2021 81 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 LEIGH ROAD
HAVANT
PO9 2ET
Phone:
02392471061
Email:
No information available