THE ST MARY'S TYNE DOCK SCHULZE ORGAN TRUST

Charity number: 510964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 September 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 September 2021 447 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 September 2021 813 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required