THE ST MARY'S TYNE DOCK SCHULZE ORGAN TRUST

Charity number: 510964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.45k £2.48k £646 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £5.25k £318 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A