Accounts and annual returns HENGOED COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1179570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 05 August 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 05 August 2021 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 June 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 June 2021 371 days late Download Open in new window