Accounts and annual returns WHITTINGHAM PRIMARY ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1175638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 October 2021 10 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2020 04 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2019 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2018 08 October 2019 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2018 Not Required