FOCUS SURREY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide affordable one to one support using the principles of Applied Behaviour Analysis to develop learning and social skills for children with Autistic Spectrum Disorder and other communication difficulties. The club provides their families with an inclusive social community where they can network with other parents of, and professionals working with, children with ASD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
81 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 14 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ARCHDALL | Chair | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Rahman | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Tibbals | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Louise Simon | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kunhui Rimington | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Masarati | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
June May Lee Goh | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|||||
AMANDA WEST | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.11k | £9.45k | £38.04k | £50.79k | £37.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.05k | £5.71k | £34.47k | £38.46k | £43.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDER (ASD) AND OTHER COMMUNICATION DIFFICULTIES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * PROVIDING A STRUCTURED SATURDAY CLUB WITHIN A SAFE, NURTURING, FUN AND CHILD-CENTRED ENVIRONMENT FOR CHILDREN WITH ASD * PROVIDING A FRIENDLY AND SOCIABLE ENVIRONMENT FOR PARENTS/CARERS AND SIBLINGS TO MEET * THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION FOR PARENTS/CARERS THROUGH ORGANISED TALKS ON ASD RELATED SUBJECTS 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDER AND OTHER COMMUNICATION DIFFICULTIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND VOLUNTEER OPPORTUNITIES IN AUTISM TEACHING METHODS BASED ON APPLIED BEHAVIOUR ANALYSIS (ABA) METHODOLOGIES * THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION SESSIONS ON ABA AND OTHER INTERVENTIONS,DEVELOPMENTS AND RELATED TOPICS WITH REGARD TO ASD
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 STANHOPE ROAD
CARSHALTON
SM5 4LH
- Phone:
- 07394045204
- Email:
- focussurrey@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window