Accounts and annual returns HEMPTON COMMON LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 1176737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 May 2020 96 days late Download Open in new window