THE FUND FOR THE REPLACEMENT OF ANIMALS IN MEDICAL EXPERIMENTS (F R A M E)

Charity number: 1176266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 February 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 February 2020 26 days late Download