Accounts and annual returns THE SIKH ASSOCIATION MANCHESTER

Charity number: 511024
Charity reporting is overdue by 489 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 July 2020 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 16 July 2020 138 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 October 2019 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 October 2019 240 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window