Financial history THE SIKH ASSOCIATION MANCHESTER

Charity number: 511024
Charity reporting is overdue by 493 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £124.68k £80.35k £73.25k £70.85k £72.44k
Total expenditure £98.17k £92.35k £72.09k £85.41k £71.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A