CAMDEN FENCING CLUB

Charity number: 1175788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 November 2018 On time Download