SWANSEA ASYLUM SEEKERS SUPPORT

Charity number: 1175186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie De Marco Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Zena Hamodat Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Alfred Sakr Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
TOM CHEESMAN Chair 01 January 1999 None on record
Ahmad Hamodat Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
DR Kathryn Nia Jones Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
GILLIAN SPEDDING Trustee 10 June 2016 None on record
Emilie Short Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
Funmilayo Olaniyan Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record