Accounts and annual returns THE BALASURIYA FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1175296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window