CREDITON CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1175015
Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 39 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2021 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 March 2021 149 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2020 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 October 2020 341 days late Download