CREDITON CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1175015
Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Caroline Frances Smith Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
HANNAH MARTIN Trustee 06 February 2017 None on record
Sarah Helen Preece Trustee 31 July 2019 None on record
Youth Pastor David Laurence Poulson Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Pastor JAMES GREGORY Chair 08 February 2017 None on record
Jessica Margaret Lee Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Christine Lesley Parsons Trustee 19 February 2018 None on record