HALE VILLAGE HALL NEW FOREST

Charity number: 1175048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Barlow Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
GARY JOHN ADAMS Trustee 09 October 2017 None on record
DEBBIE VINE Trustee 09 October 2017 None on record
James Henry Coulter Stewart Trustee 26 March 2019 None on record
DAVID MUSSELL Trustee 16 January 2018 None on record
SUE ADAMS Trustee 09 October 2017 None on record
MARJAANA BATTERBURY Trustee 09 October 2017 None on record
Sarah Louise Pook Trustee 13 July 2021 None on record
DAVID ANTHONY KENISTON Trustee 09 October 2017 None on record
MARK STEPHEN NOBES Trustee 09 October 2017 None on record
JACQUI HARTAS Chair 09 October 2017 None on record
Dr Ian Gemmell Trustee 31 August 2021 None on record