SWAFFHAM SWIMMING POOL

Charity number: 1178956
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are campaigning for the development of a community swimming pool for the people of Swaffham and the surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 June 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH ANNABEL SKINNER Chair 01 December 2014
None on record
Georgina Harries Trustee 05 February 2024
None on record
RACHEL MARY BROOKS MA, FIOS Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £60 £0 £220 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 February 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 February 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Orwell House
22 Station Street
Swaffham
Norfolk
PE37 7LH
Phone:
07881780030