Trustees NANTWICH & DISTRICT RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING
Charity number: 1175642

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Joy Dixon | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Anne Johnson Mrs | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Lawrence | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Clark | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susie McCormack | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Ann Pawsey | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JAMES POWELL | Trustee | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON KAY MOODY | Trustee | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SANER | Trustee | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.