Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY HANWELL
Charity number: 1176098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN DAND | Chair | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sarah Bush | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Martin | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Bevan | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Paula Milazzo Chaves Fernandes | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Camille Adams | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Hennessy | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN VIRGINIA WHITE | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Cosstick | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Joseph Phelan | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Davies | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Sophie Foxcroft | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Barnes | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Douglas Sebuyira | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Bevan | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edsel Edison Jodhan | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Mary Cosstick | Trustee | 01 June 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.