HAMSTERLEY TRAILBLAZERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the maintenance and construction of mtb trails at hamsterley forest. We also run regular guided rides and coaching sessions for mtb and bmx at the hub in barnard castle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
78 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 01 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
alex Talks | Chair | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER GRAHAM | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHYRN ANN GANDER | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DODS | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID RAINE | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA GRAHAM | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.25k | £14.22k | £9.29k | £11.44k | £36.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.37k | £6.42k | £16.46k | £9.49k | £13.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.00k | £3.35k | £250 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 20 November 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 20 November 2021 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MOUNTAIN BIKING IN THE TEESDALE & WEARDALE AREAS AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Beaumont Hill
DARLINGTON
DL1 3NG
- Phone:
- 07717790683
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window