Buttons Early Years Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preschool operations and training opportunities for early years sector
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 09 November 2017: CIO registration
- 09 July 2020: Funds received from 1029890 BOW BRICKHILL PRE SCHOOL
- BOW BRICKHILL PRE SCHOOL 2017 (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trisha Ann Harris | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracie Susan Bailey | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.03k | £41.48k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.93k | £51.32k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.97k | £25.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 December 2022 | 43 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Nov 2017 as amended on 09 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Cartmel Close
Bletchley
MILTON KEYNES
MK3 5LT
- Phone:
- 07973158368
- Email:
- buttonsea@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window