BLAENAU RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511095
Charity reporting is overdue by 1238 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 507 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 507 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 873 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 873 days
Annual return 30 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1238 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1238 days
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 August 2017 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required