THE MEDIATORS, ASH GREEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO Support Disabled clients within Derbyshire through acquisition and deployment of resources--people,equipment,facilities,transport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 February 1981: Standard registration
- 18 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WHITTINGTON HALL MEDIATORS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.27k | £2.21k | £6.48k | £6.69k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.97k | £1.63k | £8.48k | £6.09k | £5.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 28 JANUARY 1981 AND 26 OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF ASH GREEN HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
ASH GREEN HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window