W2 ACADEMY

Charity number: 1177263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 October 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 October 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 11 October 2018 06 January 2020 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 October 2018 Not Required