Accounts and annual returns LEATHER INSIDE OUT

Charity number: 1177993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 October 2021 21 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2021 21 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 October 2020 21 April 2022 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2020 03 May 2022 262 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 October 2019 19 February 2021 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2019 19 February 2021 189 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 October 2018 03 November 2019 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2018 19 December 2019 127 days late Download Open in new window