HOPE OF GLORY CHURCH

Charity number: 1176856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required