Financial history ALL ABOARD YOUTH ROWING

Charity number: 1176153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £78.00k £63.81k £129.36k £181.29k £234.44k
Total expenditure £57.92k £63.81k £94.40k £110.25k £180.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A