THE COMMUNITY OF THE MANY NAMES OF GOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides multifaith worship, care and support for a nation wide annual congregation of 90,000, at the three Temples in Skanda Vale monastery, SA33 6JT. Donated 84.5 tonnes of direct food aid in 2018. Is volunteer led with 78,500 volunteer hours provided by 950 volunteers across the work of the charity in 2018.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,021,845
Donations and legacies | £989.98k | |
Charitable activities | £15.50k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £449 | |
Other | £15.92k |
Total expenditure:
£696,708
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £696.71k | |
Other | £0 |
£1,268 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £696.71k | |
Retained for future use | £325.14k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £696.71k | |
Retained for future use | £326.40k |
People

10 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 10 March 1981: Standard registration
- SKANDA VALE (Working name)
- Skanda Vale Temple (Working name)
- VALE HOSPICE CONTINUING CARE (Working name)
- SKANDA VALE HOSPICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Denis Begley | Chair | 01 June 1993 |
|
|||||
Allison Taber | Trustee | 07 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jakob Willi | Trustee | 07 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Suter | Trustee | 02 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MANI GOVINDAN | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANJNA CHAVDA | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN ROSE | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Justin Raymond-Barker | Trustee | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kenneth Vivian | Trustee | 01 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
KUMI ARIYADASA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £452.10k | £318.81k | £411.38k | £739.55k | £1.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £473.05k | £443.24k | £454.94k | £581.39k | £696.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £727.19k | £989.98k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £15.50k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £303 | £449 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.06k | £15.92k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £12.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £581.39k | £696.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.63k | £14.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.23m | £5.42m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.73k | £7.00k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £137.72k | £272.66k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £68.90k | £61.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/09/1980 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 OCT 2017 as amended on 11 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD IN HIS UNIVERSALITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS OF KRISHNA AS SET OUT IN THE BHAGAVAD GITA AT THE HINDU TEMPLE MAINTAINED BY THE COMMUNITY AT SKANDA VALE OR ANY OTHER PLACES OF PUBLIC WORSHIP MAINTAINED OR USED BY THE COMMUNITY. (2) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION BY PROPAGATING TO THE PUBLIC THE SAID SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS ABOUT GOD IN HIS UNIVERSALITY. (3) TO MAINTAIN A COMMUNITY OF PEOPLE LIVING TOGETHER IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AFORESAID SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS AS A RELIGIOUS COMMUNITY. (4) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF DESERVING PERSONS AND SUPPORT CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS FOR RELIEF OF POVERTY. (5) TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS AND SUFFERING AND TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL WELL BEING OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES REQUIRING PALLIATIVE, SPECIALIST AND MEDICAL CARE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PALLIATIVE CARE,HOME CARE AND HOSPICE CARE FOR BOTH DAY PATIENTS AND RESIDENT PATIENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Skanda Vale
Llanpumsaint
Carmarthen
SA33 6JT
- Phone:
- 01559 384421
- Email:
- enquiries@skandavale.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window