CARE & CONSIDERATION WITH A SMILE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise awareness of hidden disabilities and to advise the general public, particularly those working in customer facing roles, the ways in which they can help a person with a hidden disability, to make their life easier. Spreading the word that offering care & consideration for all should be foremost in everyone's mind.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE LUXTON | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER MONAHAN | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHONA EASTON | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.80k | £841 | £185 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29k | £386 | £233 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £469 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2022 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1408 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1773 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH HIDDEN MEDICAL DISABILITIES SUCH AS RESULTING FROM STROKES, BLINDNESS, DEAFNESS AND DEPRESSION BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS THAT SOME PEOPLE IN SOCIETY HAVE A HIDDEN DISABILITY AND THEREFORE MAY JUST NEED A LITTLE EXTRA CARE AND CONSIDERATION IN EVERYDAY SITUATIONS WITH A VIEW TO CREATING MORE TOLERANCE AND CARE TOWARDS THOSE PERSONS. 2. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISABILITY BY PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PROVIDE RESPITE IN THE FORM OF DAYS OUT AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 11
The Orchard
Southway
GUILDFORD
GU2 8FR
- Phone:
- 07913627347
- Email:
- carewithasmile@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window