LITTLE TREASURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sensory groups, chess club, pre teen groups, youth groups, parents support groups, social inclusion activities, courses on autism and workshops for for parents with autistic children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
clair black | Chair | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Parkin | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire louise Dinsley | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara janet Mitchell | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Scullion | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.49k | £33.56k | £35.00k | £68.77k | £42.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.37k | £35.17k | £38.00k | £43.30k | £61.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 April 2021
(These accounts |
24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND SIBLINGS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAY AND RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN A SAFE AND SECURE ENVIRONMENT AND BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO PARENTS AND CARERS. 2) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR CHILD’S CONDITION BY PROVIDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND GENERAL SUPPORT AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Cheviot Place
PETERLEE
County Durham
SR8 2PF
- Phone:
- 07361903818
- Email:
- Littletreasures18@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window