BRAMBLEBROOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511215
Charity reporting is up to date (179 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 July 2021 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 July 2021 179 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required