DARNALL, ATTERCLIFFE AND TINSLEY IN CONTACT

Charity number: 511222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Burtenshaw Chamberlain Chair 19 March 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GLEADLESS VALLEY Received: On time
CLC INTERNATIONAL OFFICE Received: On time
Joy Darby Trustee 12 January 2017 None on record
David Whitehorn Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
Michael John Thomas Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
Dr Sally Caroline Mary Hall Trustee 25 February 2016 None on record
Lesley West Trustee 12 November 2013
SHEFFIELD STREET PASTORS Received: On time
David Mathews Smith Trustee 19 May 2013 None on record