THE CHIME HEARING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is set up to relieve people suffering from hearing loss, in particular through (1) the provision of grants or other financial assistance and (2) the provision of equipment and facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £155
Total expenditure: £1,603

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE CHIME FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Douglas Macklin Trustee 01 August 2018
EXETER CATHEDRAL MUSIC FOUNDATION (CIO)
Recently registered
DEVON PERFORMING ARTS FESTIVAL
Received: On time
DAWLISH AMATEUR REPERTORY COMPANY
Received: On time
JEFFERY KENNEDY CHINNOCK Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Jonathan Owen Parsons Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £613 £327 £1.32k £1.02k £155
Total expenditure £60 £4 £5 £2 £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Nash Gardens
Dawlish
EX7 9RR
Phone:
07545171821
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available