Accounts and annual returns STILL PARENTS TEESSIDE

Charity number: 1177466
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required