CHRISTIANS FOR EDUCATION (C4E)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting schools and colleges through the local Christian community in the Prestatyn to Rhos-on-Sea area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 13 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE PIERCE BSC PGCE | Chair | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILLIAM DUTTON | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||
GARETH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE MATTHEWS | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY HULSON BSC. M.ED. | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP PIERCE BSC, MSC, | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTONIA COULTON | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.76k | £3.21k | £3.49k | £10.24k | £10.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £3.11k | £1.26k | £5.82k | £6.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 August 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 September 2020 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES, IN SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES, AND IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE CHURCHES PREDOMINANTLY IN THE AREA OF PRESTATYN TO RHOS ON SEA, NORTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Henfryn Lodge
Henfryn Hall
Marian Mills,Trelawnyd
RHYL
Clwyd
LL18 6BT
- Phone:
- 01745571389
- Website:
-
christiansforeducation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window