Accounts and annual returns STREET FEED

Charity number: 1176362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 April 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 April 2021 15 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 April 2020 27 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 April 2020 27 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 April 2019 14 May 2020 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 April 2019 14 May 2020 77 days late Download Open in new window