Financial history THE LITTLE PRINCESS TRUST

Charity number: 1176160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £0 £19.34m £4.76m £9.09m £8.15m
Total expenditure £0 £4.20m £4.01m £7.81m £8.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £4.79m £4.54m £8.90m £7.92m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £17.64k £16.32k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £144.21k £210.96k £172.42k £195.11k
Income - Other N/A £14.41m £0 £0 £13.75k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £3.81m £3.53m £7.22m £7.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £384.68k £472.35k £591.84k £636.83k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £49.28k £84.65k £88.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £2.50m £5.88m £5.91m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £68.76k £68.76k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0