Accounts and annual returns DOLAU PARENT AND TODDLER
Charity number: 1176024
Charity reporting is overdue by 428 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 62 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 62 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 428 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 428 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 December 2023 | 568 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 December 2023 | 568 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 December 2020 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 08 December 2020 | 191 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window