LEGACY WM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Legacy WM was established in 2010 as charity with a focus on post war heritage. We have now broadened our aims to include; wellbeing, arts and community cohesion. We are based at Soho House and we work with local organisations to deliver our aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £10,790 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
Governance
- 05 November 2018: CIO registration
- 15 March 2019: Funds received from 1141498 LEGACY WM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JESSE GERALD | Chair | 05 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Andrew Peter Donaldson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachael Thomas | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rooqia Malik | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
WINSTON WEIR | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaida Bibi | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jones | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shawkat Chowdhury | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Gurpreet Bhatia | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|||||
GARY BOWMAN | Trustee | 04 May 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.10k | £345.83k | £297.21k | £480.81k | £564.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.30k | £203.10k | £307.26k | £443.94k | £720.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £68.49k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.82k | £25.96k | N/A | £10.79k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £720.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.15k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £91.89k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £72.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £125.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Nov 2018 as amended on 24 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN: (A) THE SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE WEST MIDLANDS METROPOLITAN REGION ("THE AREA") AND THE CONTRIBUTION MADE THERETO BY ASIAN, AFRICAN, CARIBBEAN AND OTHER IMMIGRANT COMMUNITIES; AND (B) WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT IN ALL THEIR FORMS (INCLUDING AND NOT LIMITED TO VISUAL, LITERARY AND PERFORMING ARTS) PRODUCED OR PERFORMED IN AREA AND IN PARTICULAR BY MEMBERS OF OR RELATING TO THE SAID COMMUNITIES. (2) TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF RESIDENTS OF THE AREA THROUGH FITNESS ACTIVITY AND EDUCATION PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOHO HOUSE
5 SOHO AVENUE
BIRMINGHAM
B18 5LB
- Phone:
- 01213488159
- Email:
- info@legacy-wm.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window