Accounts and annual returns OASIS ACADEMY SHIRLEY PARK PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1177299
Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Annual return 18 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 471 days
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2022 Overdue Overdue by 471 days
Annual return 18 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 836 days
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 836 days
Annual return 18 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1201 days
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1201 days
Annual return 18 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1567 days
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1567 days