SWAMINARAYAN SPORTS WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The provision of facilities for playing sports, 2. Educate people in the promotion of Indian culture, heritage, sports and arts, 3. To aid needy persons due to their social, economical or health issues, 4. Providing relief of poverty and financial hardship through assisting in the provision of education, training, healthcare through the necessary support required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 July 2018: Standard registration
- SWAMINARYAN SPORTS WORLD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHIMJI RAMJI HIRANI | Chair | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
BHIMJI SHIVJI PATEL | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAYESH HARJI PATEL | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PULKIT BHIKHALAL KORAT | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MANESH KANJI HIRANI | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.82k | £29.35k | £60.02k | £29.03k | £52.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.59k | £12.99k | £33.41k | £31.30k | £27.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.39k | £19.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2023 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2023 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 425 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 425 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN GREATER LONDON, ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORTS WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH BY INVOLVING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION; 4.2 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GREATER LONDON AND ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS; IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS, 4.3 TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS; FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: 4.3.1 CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; AND 4.3.2 VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swaminarayan Sports World
Sports Ground
Blake Hall Road
LONDON
E11 2QW
- Phone:
- 02085329354
- Email:
- info@ssworld.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window